IL HB4397 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0635
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0635
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Student Loan Servicing Rights Act. Provides that, as used in the Act, "student loan servicer" does not include a law firm or licensed attorney that is collecting post-default debt. Effective December 31, 2018.
Title
STUDENT LOAN SERVICER-DEBT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-13 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-13 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-27 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0635 |
2018-07-27 | House | Effective Date December 31, 2018 |
2018-07-27 | House | Governor Approved |
2018-06-14 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-16 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2018 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 3, 2018 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 011-000-000 |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 17, 2018 |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen |
2018-04-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2018-04-13 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 100-000-000 |
2018-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-03-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-03-07 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 011-000-000 |
2018-03-07 | House | Reported Back To Judiciary - Civil Committee; |
2018-03-07 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 005-000-000 |
2018-02-28 | House | To Commercial Law Subcommittee |
2018-02-12 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2018-01-30 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-01-30 | House | First Reading |
2018-01-30 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lou Lang |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
110 | 992 | 1-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |