IL HB4386 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-09 - Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-09 - Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Brownfields Redevelopment and Intermodal Promotion Act. Provides that moneys in the South Suburban Brownfields Redevelopment Fund shall be held to fund eligible projects through fiscal year 2031 (currently 2021). Provides that the life span of the South Suburban Brownfields Redevelopment Fund may be extended past 2036 (currently, 2026). Provides that the total amount of tax increment to be transferred to the South Suburban Brownfields Redevelopment Fund may not exceed $4,000,000 in any fiscal year (currently, $3,000,000).
Title
BROWNFIELDS REDEVELOPMENT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-09 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-01-09 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-01-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-01-09 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 012-000-000 |
2021-01-08 | House | Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed 066-039-000 |
2021-01-08 | House | Moved to Suspend Rule 21 Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2021-01-08 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-03 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2020-01-29 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-01-29 | House | First Reading |
2020-01-29 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. William Davis |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 607 | 3-20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 607 | 3-25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4386&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB4386.htm |