IL HB4385 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-12 - Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-12 - Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that if the defendant was in the custody of the Department of Corrections at the time of the commission of the offense, each sentence for an offense committed while the defendant was in custody of the Department of Corrections (rather than the sentence) shall be served consecutive to the sentence under which the defendant is held for an offense committed before the defendant was held in custody of (rather than by) the Department of Corrections. Provides that if a person charged with a felony commits a separate felony while on pretrial release or in pretrial detention in a county jail facility or county detention facility, then each sentence (rather than the sentences) imposed upon conviction of these felonies shall be served consecutively regardless of the order in which the judgments of conviction are entered.
Title
CD CORR-CONSECUTIVE SENTENCE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-12 | House | Tabled |
2018-04-12 | House | Tabled Pursuant to Rule 22(g)-5 |
2018-04-12 | House | Motion Do Not Pass Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 003-002-000; -SUBCOMMITTEE |
2018-04-12 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2018-04-12 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Judiciary - Criminal Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2018-04-10 | House | Motion Filed to Discharge Committee Judiciary - Criminal Committee; Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2018-04-09 | House | To Sentencing, Penalties and Criminal Procedure Subcommittee |
2018-04-09 | House | To Criminal Administration and Enforcement Subcommittee |
2018-02-27 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2018-01-30 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-01-30 | House | First Reading |
2018-01-30 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
730 | 5 | 5-8-4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4385&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4385.htm |