IL HB4378 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2022 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-03-16 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Parental Notice of Abortion Act of 2022, with provisions similar to those of the Parental Notice of Abortion Act of 1995. Repeals the Youth Health and Safety Act. Effective upon becoming law or on the date Public Act 102-685 takes effect, whichever is later.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PARENTAL NOTICE OF ABORTION

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-03-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter
2022-03-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier
2022-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski
2022-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2022-02-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson
2022-02-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
2022-02-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2022-02-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney
2022-02-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
2022-02-18HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2022-02-09HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2022-01-21HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2022-01-21HouseFirst Reading
2022-01-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst
2022-01-06HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Paul Jacobs

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
204111ActRepealed CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback