IL HB4366 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-19 - Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-19 - Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Identification Card Act and the Illinois Vehicle Code. Allows the issuance of an identification card or a driver's license with a veteran designation to a member of the armed forces, including a member of any reserve component or National Guard unit, regardless of whether he or she served on active duty. Defines "reserve duty". Makes conforming changes.
Title
SOS-RESERVE VET ID & LICENSE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-13 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-19 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2016-07-14 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-04-18 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. William R. Haine |
2016-04-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John D. Anthony |
2016-04-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2016-04-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez |
2016-04-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2016-04-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2016-04-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2016-04-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger |
2016-04-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2016-04-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2016-04-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel |
2016-04-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dwight Kay |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 14, 2016 |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2016-04-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris |
2016-04-13 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-000-000 |
2016-04-12 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2016-04-12 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-07 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 009-000-000 |
2016-04-06 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2016-04-05 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-04-05 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2016-04-05 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2016-04-05 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 008-000-000 |
2016-04-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2016-03-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-03-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2016-03-23 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2016-01-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-01-13 | House | First Reading |
2015-12-21 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 335 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 6-106 | Amended Code | Citation Text |