IL HB4364 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-09 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-09 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Finance Act. Creates the Fund Mental Health and Substance Use Prevention Fund as a special fund in the State treasury. Provides that the Department of Human Services must make grants, from appropriations made from the Fund, to units of local government and Illinois public universities for the purposes of providing mental health and substance abuse prevention to people who are incarcerated and providing mental health and substance abuse prevention for those encountering the criminal justice system with a primary focus to people who are incarcerated in the county jail or recently discharged. Provides that, notwithstanding any other provision of law, moneys in the Fund Mental Health and Substance Use Prevention Fund may not be appropriated, assigned, or transferred to another State fund.
Title
TECHNOLOGY DEVELOPMENT ACCOUNT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - Motion in House (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - Motion in House (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-09 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2022-04-07 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1, 2 |
2022-04-07 | House | Arrived in House |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John Connor |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-002-000 |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Loughran-Cappel |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Loughran-Cappel |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Patrick J. Joyce |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. John Connor |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 015-000-000 |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 016-000-000 |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Executive |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Executive |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 8, 2022 |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 4, 2022 |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Second Reading |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 1, 2022 |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-03-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2022-03-03 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 104-000-000 |
2022-03-02 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day |
2022-03-01 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2022-02-17 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2022-02-17 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2022-02-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2022-02-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2022-02-02 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar State Government Administration Committee; 008-000-000 |
2022-02-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2022-02-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2022-02-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2022-01-25 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2022-01-05 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-05 | House | First Reading |
2022-01-05 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 265 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 265 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |