IL HB4360 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Central Management Services Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Repeals provisions relating to the higher education supplier diversity report and race and gender wage reports and moves those provisions, with changes, to the Commission on Equity and Inclusion Act. Amends the Energy Transition Act. Provides that the Commission on Equity and Inclusion certifies or recognizes certification for Minority Business Enterprise certification (rather than the Department of Central Management Services) or a program with equivalent requirements. Provides that the Clean Energy Primes Contractor Accelerator Program shall provide participants with opportunities to be listed in any relevant directories and databases organized by the Commission on Equity and Inclusion (rather than organized by the Department of Central Management Services). Amends the Blind Vendors Act. Provides that it is the intent of this Act that all State agencies, particularly the Commission on Equity and Inclusion (rather than the Department of Central Management Services), promote and advocate for the Business Enterprise Program for the Blind. Amends the Illinois Procurement Code. Provides that the Business Enterprise Program is a program of the Commission on Equity and Inclusion (rather than the Department of Central Management Services). Amends the Business Enterprise for Minorities, Women, and Persons with Disabilities Act. Removes provisions relating to a study and report that measured the impact of discrimination on minority and women business development in Illinois that was to be completed by October 28, 2010. Provides that the Commission on Equity and Inclusion (rather than the Department of Central Management Services) shall conduct a new social scientific study that measures the impact of discrimination on minority and women business development in Illinois, shall issue a report, and shall establish a specified model between 2028 and 2029. Changes various references to the Department of Central Management Services to the Commission on Equity and Inclusion. Extends the date on which the Act will be repealed from June 30, 2029 to June 30, 2030. Effective immediately.
Title
COMM EQUITY&INCLUSION-VARIOUS
Sponsors
Rep. Sonya Harper [D] | Rep. Marcus Evans [D] | Rep. Cyril Nichols [D] | Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin [D] |
Rep. William Davis [D] | Rep. Yolanda Morris [D] | Rep. Dagmara Avelar [D] | Sen. Christopher Belt [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-17 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 98 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-04-18 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2024-04-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar |
2024-04-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Yolonda Morris |
2024-04-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William "Will" Davis |
2024-04-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2024-04-17 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 098-008-000 |
2024-04-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Cyril Nichols |
2024-04-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2024-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-03-14 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-03-13 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 012-000-000 |
2024-03-05 | House | Assigned to Higher Education Committee |
2024-01-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-01-16 | House | First Reading |
2024-01-05 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 2421 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 405 | 405-530 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
20 | 405 | 405-535 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
20 | 730 | 5-55 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 500 | 15-25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 574 | 40-15 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 574 | 40-20 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 575 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 575 | 6a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 575 | 8c | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 575 | 8g | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 575 | 8j | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 575 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |