IL HB4348 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on August 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-17 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0901
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on August 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-17 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0901
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Missing Persons Identification Act. Provides that the responsible investigative agency shall send the National Missing and Unidentified Persons System created by the United States Department of Justice, if possible, with copies of fingerprints on standardized 8 inch by 8 inch fingerprint cards or the equivalent digital image, prints or partial prints of any fingers, a forensic odontology report concerning the body, detailed personal descriptions, DNA samples for nuclear and mitochondrial DNA analysis, available DNA analysis results, and all other identifying data, including date and place of death, of all deceased persons whose deaths are in a classification requiring inquiry by the coroner or medical examiner and who remain unidentified after all available methods have been exhausted. Provides that the medical examiner, coroner, or responsible investigative agency shall make reasonable attempts to promptly identify human remains. Defines "responsible investigative authority".
Title
UNIDENTIFIED HUMAN REMAINS
Sponsors
Sen. John Connor [D] | Rep. Michael McAuliffe [R] | Rep. Dan Brady [R] | Rep. Juliana Stratton [D] |
Rep. Litesa Wallace [D] | Sen. Antonio Munoz [D] | Sen. William Haine [D] | Sen. John Mulroe [D] |
Sen. Tim Bivins [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-17 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0901 |
2018-08-17 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2019 |
2018-08-17 | House | Governor Approved |
2018-06-29 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-31 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-31 | House | House Concurs |
2018-05-31 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 109-000-000 |
2018-05-29 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 013-000-000 |
2018-05-28 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2018-05-28 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-28 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. John Connor |
2018-05-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2018-05-24 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000 |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 22, 2018 |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 15, 2018 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended State Government; 006-000-000 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Tim Bivins |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. William R. Haine |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton |
2018-04-19 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000 |
2018-04-18 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-04-18 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 013-000-000 |
2018-04-17 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2018-03-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-03-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. John Connor |
2018-03-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-03-07 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2018-03-06 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 011-000-001 |
2018-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2018-02-27 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2018-01-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-01-26 | House | First Reading |
2018-01-25 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. John Connor |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
50 | 722 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |