IL HB4348 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 40-10)
Status: Introduced on December 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-08-16 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-08-16 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Firearm Owners Identification Card Act. Provides that a unit of local government, including a home rule unit, may not impose any tax, fee, or other assessment other than the normal sales tax rate for goods, on any firearms, firearm attachments, or firearm ammunition. Provides that the provisions of any ordinance or resolution on or after the effective date of the amendatory Act by any municipal or county government that imposes any tax, fee, or other assessment other than the normal sales tax rate for goods are invalid and all those existing ordinances and resolutions are void. Defines "sales tax". Effective immediately.
Title
FIREARM OWNERS ID-LOCAL REG
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen |
2016-04-22 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2016-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2016-04-08 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) April 22, 2016 |
2016-04-06 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2016-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew F Skoog |
2016-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith P. Sommer |
2016-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2016-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez |
2016-02-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2016-01-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes |
2016-01-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeanne M Ives |
2016-01-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2016-01-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2016-01-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2016-01-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chad Hays |
2016-01-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2016-01-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2016-01-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ed Sullivan |
2016-01-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ron Sandack |
2016-01-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Donald L. Moffitt |
2016-01-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney |
2016-01-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2016-01-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
2016-01-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel |
2016-01-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2016-01-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2016-01-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2016-01-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2016-01-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson |
2016-01-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Cavaletto |
2016-01-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2016-01-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David R. Leitch |
2016-01-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Adam Brown |
2016-01-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katherine Cloonen |
2016-01-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2016-01-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David B. Reis |
2015-12-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2015-12-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2015-12-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2015-12-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bill Mitchell |
2015-12-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dwight Kay |
2015-12-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore |
2015-12-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2015-12-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2015-12-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
2015-12-15 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2015-12-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Reginald Phillips |
2015-12-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John D. Anthony |
2015-12-14 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2015-12-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Smiddy |
2015-12-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2015-12-11 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John Bradley |
2015-12-11 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2015-12-02 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-12-02 | House | First Reading |
2015-12-02 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
430 | 65 | 13.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4348&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/09900HB4348.htm |