IL HB4342 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Cannabis Control Act, the Illinois Controlled Substances Act, and the Methamphetamine Control and Community Protection Act. For drug offenses that occur in protected places, provides that the distance away from the protected place shall be 500 feet in a county with a population of 3,000,000 or more or 1,000 feet in any other county.
Title
DRUG OFFENSES-ENHANCED PENALTY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow |
2018-01-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-01-26 | House | First Reading |
2018-01-25 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 550 | 5.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 570 | 407 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 646 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4342&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4342.htm |