IL HB4339 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 17 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-08-01 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 17 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-08-01 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates $5,000,000 from the Capital Development Fund to the Department of Natural Resources for expenditure by the Office of Water Resources for a water development project. Effective immediately.
Title
$DNR-OFFICE OF WATER RESOURCES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-01 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2016-01-26 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-General Services Committee |
2015-12-02 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-12-02 | House | First Reading |
2015-11-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4339&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/PDF/09900HB4339.pdf |