IL HB4326 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on November 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-17 - Total Veto Stands - No Positive Action Taken
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on November 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-17 - Total Veto Stands - No Positive Action Taken
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that the Department of Corrections shall operate the Hardin County Work Camp located in Cave-In-Rock, Illinois. Effective immediately.
Title
CD CORR-HARDIN CTY WORK CAMP
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-31 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 36 N: 14 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 69 N: 34 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 69 N: 34 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-17 | House | Total Veto Stands - No Positive Action Taken |
2016-11-16 | House | Motion Filed Override Governor Veto Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2016-11-02 | House | Placed on Calendar Total Veto |
2016-08-19 | House | Governor Vetoed |
2016-06-27 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2016-05-31 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 036-014-003 |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2016 |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 26, 2016 |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Second Reading |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 23, 2016 |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Do Pass State Government and Veterans Affairs; 006-002-000 |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Waive Posting Notice |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2016-05-13 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 27, 2016 |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-03-01 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Gary Forby |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2016-03-01 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 069-034-008 |
2016-02-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John Bradley |
2016-02-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-02-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-02-11 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-02-11 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Appropriations-Public Safety Committee; 015-003-005 |
2016-02-04 | House | Re-assigned to Appropriations-Public Safety Committee |
2016-01-29 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) April 28, 2016 |
2015-12-04 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) January 29, 2016 |
2015-12-02 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2015-11-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2015-11-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-11-09 | House | First Reading |
2015-11-02 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |