IL HB4312 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 62-3)
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-15 - Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-15 - Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Public Community College Act. Provides for the election (instead of appointment) of members of the Board of Trustees of Community College District No. 508 (City Colleges of Chicago). Effective immediately.
Title
COM COL-CHICAGO-ELECT BOARD
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-15 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2016-11-15 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2016-11-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2016-06-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2016-06-15 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2016-05-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2016-05-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2016-05-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. William Delgado |
2016-05-20 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As January 10, 2017 |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-05-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2016-05-18 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-002-000 |
2016-05-18 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-05-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2016-05-03 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-05-03 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 27, 2016 |
2016-05-03 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-000-000 |
2016-04-22 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2016-04-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended |
2016-04-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended |
2016-04-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed as Amended |
2016-04-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Ron Sandack |
2016-04-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Ron Sandack |
2016-04-21 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-20 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-20 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-20 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-20 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 013-001-000 |
2016-04-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Higher Education Committee; by Voice Vote |
2016-04-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Higher Education Committee |
2016-04-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-04-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robert Martwick |
2016-04-14 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) April 22, 2016 |
2016-04-14 | House | Assigned to Higher Education Committee |
2016-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2016-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2016-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2016-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2016-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Monique D. Davis |
2016-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2016-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2016-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Eddie Lee Jackson, Sr. |
2016-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2016-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2016-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2016-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2016-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2016-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2016-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore |
2016-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2016-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2016-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2016-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2016-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2016-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2016-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2016-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2016-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Smiddy |
2016-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katherine Cloonen |
2016-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo |
2016-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2016-04-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2016-04-04 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2016-04-04 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2016-04-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2016-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2016-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2016-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2016-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2016-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2016-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2016-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2016-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2016-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2016-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2016-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2016-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2016-02-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2016-02-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2016-02-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2016-02-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2016-02-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Pamela Reaves-Harris |
2016-02-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2016-02-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2016-02-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2016-01-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2016-01-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang |
2016-01-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2016-01-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2015-10-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-10-14 | House | First Reading |
2015-10-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robert Martwick |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
110 | 805 | 3-7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 805 | 7-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 805 | 7-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 805 | 7-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |