IL HB4305 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 57-0)
Status: Engrossed on November 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-08-01 - Rule 19(b) / Motion Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-08-01 - Rule 19(b) / Motion Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Makes appropriations to the Department of Transportation from the Motor Fuel Tax Fund for specified payments to local governments. Makes appropriations to the Illinois Gaming Board from the State Gaming Fund for distributions to local governments for admissions and wager tax, including prior year costs. Makes appropriations to the Department of the Lottery from the State Lottery Fund for payment of prizes to holders of winning lottery tickets or shares, including prizes related to Multi-State Lottery games, and payment of promotional or incentive prizes associated with the sale of lottery tickets. Makes appropriations from the Wireless Service Emergency Fund and the Statewide 9-1-1 Fund to the Department of State Police for the Statewide 911 Administrator Program and for costs pursuant to the Emergency Telephone System Act, respectively. Makes appropriations from the Wireless Service Emergency Fund to the Illinois Commerce Commission for specified emergency telecommunications purposes. Effective immediately.
Title
$LOCAL GOVERNMENTS/LOTTERY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-11-10 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-01 | House | Rule 19(b) / Motion Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-11-10 | House | Motion Filed to Reconsider Vote Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2015-11-10 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-001-001 |
2015-11-10 | House | 3/5 Vote Required |
2015-11-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2015-11-10 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-11-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted |
2015-11-10 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-11-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emily McAsey |
2015-11-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000 |
2015-11-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-11-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2015-11-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-11-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2015-10-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2015-10-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kenneth Dunkin |
2015-10-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-10-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2015-10-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2015-10-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore |
2015-10-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2015-10-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2015-10-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2015-10-20 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-10-20 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-10-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2015-10-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2015-10-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2015-10-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2015-10-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2015-10-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Eddie Lee Jackson, Sr. |
2015-10-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2015-10-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2015-10-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2015-10-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2015-10-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2015-10-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi |
2015-10-20 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-10-20 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-002-000 |
2015-10-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote |
2015-10-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2015-10-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Pamela Reaves-Harris |
2015-10-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2015-10-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2015-10-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-10-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2015-10-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2015-10-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo |
2015-10-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2015-10-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2015-10-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2015-10-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Bradley |
2015-10-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2015-10-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2015-10-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2015-10-14 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2015-10-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-10-14 | House | First Reading |
2015-10-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2015-10-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente |
2015-10-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2015-10-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2015-10-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Smiddy |
2015-10-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2015-10-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2015-10-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2015-10-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2015-10-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2015-10-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2015-10-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang |
2015-10-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katherine Cloonen |
2015-10-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2015-10-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2015-10-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2015-10-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frank J. Mautino |
2015-10-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2015-10-01 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2015-10-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2015-10-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2015-10-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2015-10-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2015-09-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2015-09-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2015-09-30 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Martin J. Moylan |