IL HB4301 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Ivory Ban Act. Renames the Act the Animal Parts and Products Ban Act. Makes the Act applicable to animal parts or products. Defines "animal part or product" as, in addition to ivory and rhinoceros horn, any item that contains, or is wholly or partially made from, the following animal family, genus, or species: cheetah, elephant, giraffe, great ape, hippopotamus, jaguar, leopard, lion, monk seal, narwhal, pangolin, ray or shark, rhinoceros, sea turtle, tiger, walrus, or whale, insofar as the species, subspecies, or distinct population segment is listed on specified endangered species lists. Authorizes the Department of Natural Resources to permit the transfer of covered animal parts or products to or from a museum. Makes changes concerning exemptions for certain antiques.
Title
ANIMAL PARTS AND PRODUCTS BAN
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-17 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter |
2020-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2020-02-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2020-02-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor |
2020-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2020-02-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2020-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2020-02-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Pappas |
2020-02-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2020-02-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2020-01-28 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-01-28 | House | First Reading |
2020-01-28 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
815 | 357 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
815 | 357 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
815 | 357 | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
815 | 357 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
815 | 357 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4301&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB4301.htm |