IL HB4298 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Notice By Publication Act. Provides that if a governmental unit, community college district, or school district is required to provide notice by publication in a newspaper by law, order of court, or contract, the governmental unit may publish the notice on an official government website instead of in a newspaper. Provides conditions concerning the availability and format of the notice webpage. Repeals a Section concerning the placement of published notices on a statewide website and makes corresponding changes throughout the Act and in the Newspaper Legal Notice Act. Effective immediately.
Title
NOTICES-ELECTRONIC PUBLICATION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-10 | House | Motion Withdrawn Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2018-04-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-13 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-12 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2018-04-12 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Cost Benefit Analysis Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2018-04-11 | House | Motion Filed to Discharge Committee Cost Benefit Analysis Committee; Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2018-03-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Cost Benefit Analysis Committee |
2018-03-02 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-03-02 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2018-02-07 | House | To Analytics Subcommittee |
2018-01-30 | House | Assigned to Cost Benefit Analysis Committee |
2018-01-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-01-26 | House | First Reading |
2018-01-22 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
715 | 10 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
715 | 10 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
715 | 5 | 2.1 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
715 | 5 | 2.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
715 | 5 | 3.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
715 | 5 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |