IL HB4297 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Introduced on September 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-19 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-19 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Research Dogs and Cats Adoption Act. Requires (i) an institution of higher education located in this State that receives public funds for scientific, educational, or research purposes or (ii) a facility that provides research in collaboration with an institution of higher education with the use of public funds and that confines dogs or cats for scientific, educational, or research purposes and plans on euthanizing the dog or cat for other than scientific, educational, or research purposes must first offer the dog or cat to an animal rescue organization. Provides exceptions. Sets forth provisions concerning an agreement with an animal rescue organization and immunity.
Title
HIGHER ED-RESEARCH DOGS/CATS
Sponsors
Rep. Margo McDermed [R] | Rep. Christine Winger [R] | Rep. Daniel Burke [D] | Rep. David McSweeney [R] |
Rep. Ann Williams [D] | Sen. Sara Feigenholtz [D] | Rep. Sheri Jesiel [R] | Rep. Michael McAuliffe [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2016-04-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2016-04-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2016-04-08 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2016-04-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2016-03-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-03-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Margo McDermed |
2016-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel |
2016-02-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2016-02-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-02-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Margo McDermed |
2016-02-08 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2016-02-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney |
2016-02-04 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2016-02-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2015-12-02 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2015-10-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger |
2015-09-24 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-09-24 | House | First Reading |
2015-09-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2015-09-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2015-09-21 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Margo McDermed |