IL HB4296 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 21 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-28 - Assigned to Appropriations-Public Safety Committee
Pending: House Appropriations-Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 21 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-28 - Assigned to Appropriations-Public Safety Committee
Pending: House Appropriations-Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates $5,000,000 to the Illinois Route 66 Centennial Commission Trust Fund for cost incurred by the Commission in furtherance of the Illinois Route 66 Centennial Commission Act. Effective July 1, 2024.
Title
$RTE 66 CENTENNIAL COMMISSION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-28 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Public Safety Committee |
2024-01-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-01-16 | House | First Reading |
2023-12-21 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lawrence "Larry" Walsh, Jr. |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4296&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/PDF/10300HB4296.pdf |