IL HB4295 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on December 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Environmental Protection Act. In provisions regarding lead service line replacement and notification, provides that as lead service lines are replaced in accordance with the provisions, an owner or operator of a community water supply shall, when practicable, comply with specified provisions of the Illinois Plumbing Code. Provides that when doing so will create an undue hardship due to excessive structural or mechanical difficulty, or impracticability, the owner or operator of the community water supply shall automatically be granted a variance by the Department of Public Health and be exempt from the separation requirements of the specified provisions. Effective immediately.
Title
EPA-LEAD SERVICE LINES
Sponsors
Rep. Denyse Wang Stoneback [D] | Rep. Lamont Robinson [D] | Rep. Robyn Gabel [D] | Rep. Kathleen Willis [D] |
Rep. Kelly Cassidy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-18 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 3 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2022-02-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2022-02-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Denyse Wang Stoneback |
2022-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2022-02-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2022-02-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2022-02-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Denyse Wang Stoneback |
2022-02-01 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-01 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Denyse Wang Stoneback |
2022-01-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2022-01-11 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2022-01-05 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-05 | House | First Reading |
2022-01-03 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr. |
2021-12-20 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Denyse Wang Stoneback |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
415 | 5 | 17.12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |