IL HB4293 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Wage Payment and Collection Act. Provides that an employee is entitled to recover damages of 5% (rather than 2%) of the amount of any underpayments in wages for each month following the date of payment during which such underpayments remain unpaid. Effective immediately.
Title
WAGE THEFT-DAMAGES AMOUNT
Sponsors
Rep. Will Guzzardi [D] | Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez [D] | Rep. Kambium Buckner [D] | Rep. Barbara Hernandez [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2020-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2020-03-03 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2020-03-03 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2020-03-03 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2020-02-27 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2020-02-26 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 019-009-000 |
2020-02-04 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2020-01-28 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-01-28 | House | First Reading |
2020-01-28 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Will Guzzardi |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
820 | 115 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |