IL HB4293 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Imposes a privilege tax on partnerships and S corporations engaged in the business of conducting investment management services. Provides that the tax shall be imposed at the rate of 20% of the fees calculated by reference to the performance of the investment portfolio funds and not from the investment itself. Defines "investment management services".
Title
INC TX-INVESTMENT SERVICES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2018-05-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2018-05-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2018-05-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2018-05-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi |
2018-05-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2018-05-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2018-05-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2018-05-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2018-05-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2018-05-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2018-05-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2018-05-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2018-05-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita |
2018-05-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2018-05-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2018-05-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2018-05-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2018-05-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell |
2018-05-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2018-05-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2018-04-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2018-04-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2018-04-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2018-04-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2018-04-13 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-14 | House | To Growth, Reform & Fairness Subcommittee |
2018-02-05 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2018-01-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-01-22 | House | First Reading |
2018-01-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 5 | 205 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4293&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4293.htm |