IL HB4292 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Requires a school board to enroll its elementary schools in the Scripps National Spelling Bee program and implement an annual district-wide spelling bee competition for students in the 7th grade. Provides that members of the public must be permitted to attend the competition, and the school district shall publish notice of the date of the competition in a newspaper of general circulation within the district. Effective July 1, 2018.
Title
SCH CD-7TH GRADE SPELLING BEE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-13 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2018-02-14 | House | To SPECIAL Issues Subcommittee |
2018-02-05 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2018-01-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-01-22 | House | First Reading |
2018-01-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 10-20.67 | New Code | See Bill Text |
105 | 5 | 34-18.60 | New Code | See Bill Text |