IL HB4291 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Abused and Neglected Child Reporting Act. In a provision permitting 2 or more mandated reporters from the same workplace to designate one reporter to make a single report concerning the group's shared belief that a child may be abused or neglected, provides that the report made by the designated reporter shall include the name, business address, and telephone number of the mandated reporter; the capacity that makes the person a mandated reporter; and the information that gave rise to the knowledge or reasonable suspicion of child abuse or neglect and the source or sources of that information. Provides that the report shall also include, if known, certain information on the child, the child's parents and guardians, and the person or persons who the mandated reporter knows or reasonably suspects to have abused or neglected the child. Requires the designated mandated reporter to make a report even if some of the required information is not known or is uncertain to the reporter. Removes the requirement that the report include the names and contact information for the other mandated reporters. In a provision permitting any other person who is not a mandated reporter to make a child abuse or neglect report, provides that the Department of Children and Family Services shall ask the reporter to provide in the report his or her name, telephone number, information that gave rise to the knowledge or reasonable suspicion of child abuse or neglect, and the source or sources of the information that gave rise to the knowledge or reasonable suspicion of child abuse or neglect. Provides that if the reporter refuses to provide his or her name or telephone number, the Department shall make efforts to determine the basis for that refusal and advise the reporter that the identifying information will remain confidential.
Title
CHILD ABUSE-MANDATED RPTS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-16 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar |
2024-04-16 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2024-04-16 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado |
2024-04-16 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2024-04-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar |
2024-04-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2024-04-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado |
2024-04-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2024-04-05 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-21 | House | To Investigations and Reporting Subcommittee |
2024-02-14 | House | Assigned to Adoption & Child Welfare Committee |
2024-01-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-01-16 | House | First Reading |
2023-12-20 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dan Caulkins |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
325 | 5 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4291&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB4291.htm |