IL HB4290 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Children and Family Services Act. Prohibits the Department of Children and Family Services from requiring Department volunteers to list or provide their social security numbers on any form prescribed by the Department that authorizes a criminal history record or background check. Requires the Department to amend its rule on authorization forms in accordance with the amendatory Act. Excludes the social security number of a Department volunteer from the definition of "background information."
Title
DCFS-CRIM CHECKS-SSN BAN
Sponsors
Rep. Ryan Spain [R] | Rep. Steven Reick [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2025-01-07 | House | Session Sine Die |
2024-04-05 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-03-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick |
2024-03-12 | House | Assigned to Adoption & Child Welfare Committee |
2024-01-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-01-16 | House | First Reading |
2023-12-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Ryan Spain |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 505 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4290&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB4290.htm |