IL HB4286 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on August 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-09-08 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on August 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-09-08 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that all money in the Mammogram Fund from the sale of Mammogram license plates shall be paid as grants to the Illinois Public Health Association (rather than the Susan G. Komen Foundation) for breast cancer research, education, screening, and treatment. Effective immediately.
Title
VEH CD-MAMMOGRAM PLATE FUND
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-09-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2015-09-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2015-09-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2015-09-02 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-09-02 | House | First Reading |
2015-08-27 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. David R. Leitch |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 3-643 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4286&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/09900HB4286.htm |