IL HB4284 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-28 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0587
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-28 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0587
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Extension Limitation Law in the Property Tax Code. Provides that, for the purpose of calculating the limiting rate for levy year 2023, the last preceding aggregate extension base for Homewood School District No. 153 in Cook County shall be $19,535,377. Effective immediately.
Title
PTELL-HOMEWOOD SCH DIST
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 42 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 70 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 70 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-28 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0587 |
2024-05-28 | House | Effective Date May 28, 2024 |
2024-05-28 | House | Governor Approved |
2024-05-28 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2024-05-23 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2024-05-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 042-017-000 |
2024-05-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 23, 2024 |
2024-05-22 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-05-22 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 24, 2024 |
2024-05-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 22, 2024 |
2024-05-22 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 008-003-000 |
2024-05-17 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 24, 2024 |
2024-05-10 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 17, 2024 |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 10, 2024 |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-04-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2024-04-15 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 070-036-000 |
2024-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-04 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-04 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 013-005-000 |
2024-04-04 | House | Reported Back To Revenue & Finance Committee; |
2024-04-04 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Revenue & Finance Committee; 004-001-000 |
2024-03-08 | House | To Revenue - Property Tax Subcommittee |
2024-02-28 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2024-01-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-01-16 | House | First Reading |
2023-12-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. William "Will" Davis |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 200 | 18-185 | Amended Code | Citation Text |