IL HB4279 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Natural Resources Act. Provides that the Department of Natural Resources has the authority to accept, receive, and administer on behalf of the State, federal grant funds associated with the development or preservation of recreational boating infrastructure on this State's waterways and distribute those funds as prescribed by the appropriate federal agency. Provides that funds received by the Department shall be deposited into the Natural Resources Federal Boating Infrastructure Grant Dollars Fund and used for these purposes. Makes conforming changes in the State Finance Act.
Title
DNR-RECREATIONAL BOAT FUNDING
Sponsors
Rep. Jerry Costello [D] | Rep. Jerry Long [R] | Rep. Christian Mitchell [D] | Rep. David Welter [R] |
Sen. Bill Brady [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-07 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-11-15 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Postponed - State Government |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Postponed - State Government |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-03-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Chris Nybo |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Lee Long |
2018-03-07 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-000-000 |
2018-03-06 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-03-06 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-03-01 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-03-01 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 008-000-000 |
2018-03-01 | House | Reported Back To Revenue & Finance Committee; |
2018-03-01 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Revenue & Finance Committee; 004-000-000 |
2018-02-14 | House | To Growth, Reform & Fairness Subcommittee |
2018-02-05 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2018-01-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-01-19 | House | First Reading |
2018-01-18 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 801 | 1-15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 105 | 5.886 | New Code | See Bill Text |