IL HB4274 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-10-21 - Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-10-21 - Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Municipal Code if and only if House Bill 106 of the 102nd General Assembly becomes law in the form in which it passed both houses on October 28, 2021. Allows the Minority Leader of the House of Representatives and the Minority Leader of the Senate to appoint one member each to an advisory committee that determines which homes contain windows or doors that cause offensive odors and are eligible for replacement pursuant to the Residential Sound Insulation Program. Effective immediately or the date that House Bill 106 takes effect, whichever is later.
Title
MUNI CD-COMMITTEE APPOINTMENTS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-03 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-21 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-03-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2022-03-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2022-03-03 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-000-000 |
2022-03-03 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-03 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2022-03-03 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 013-000-000 |
2022-03-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee |
2022-03-01 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-01 | House | Removed from Consent Calendar Status Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar |
2022-03-01 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-03-01 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar |
2022-02-17 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2022-02-17 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2022-02-16 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2022-02-15 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 013-000-000 |
2022-02-09 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee |
2022-01-05 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-05 | House | First Reading |
2021-12-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Seth Lewis |
2021-12-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
65 | 5 | 11-101-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |