IL HB4274 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Compensation Review Act. Provides that members of the General Assembly are prohibited from receiving and shall not receive any increase in compensation that would otherwise apply based on a cost of living adjustment for or during the fiscal year beginning July 1, 2018. Provides that members of the General Assembly are prohibited from receiving and shall not receive any increase in compensation that would otherwise apply based on a cost of living adjustment for terms commencing on or after July 1, 2018, unless otherwise approved by law. Effective immediately.
Title
GA-COLA PROHIBITED
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-13 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-12 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2018-01-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-01-19 | House | First Reading |
2018-01-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4274&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4274.htm |