IL HB4271 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-1)
Status: Passed on May 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-06 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0731
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-1)
Status: Passed on May 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-06 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0731
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. Provides that a group or individual policy of accident and health insurance or managed care plan that is amended, delivered, issued, or renewed on or after January 1, 2023 shall provide coverage for medically necessary breast reduction surgery. Makes conforming changes in the State Employees Group Insurance Act of 1971, the Counties Code, the Illinois Municipal Code, the School Code, the Health Maintenance Organization, the Limited Health Service Organization Act, and the Voluntary Health Services Plans Act.
Title
INS-BREAST REDUCTION SURGERY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - Motion in House (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - Motion in House (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-06 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0731 |
2022-05-06 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2023 |
2022-05-06 | House | Governor Approved |
2022-04-27 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2022-04-22 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2022-03-29 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 24, 2022 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Second Reading |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Do Pass Insurance; 011-000-000 |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Assigned to Insurance |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-03-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2022-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2022-03-03 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 104-000-000 |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer |
2022-03-02 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day |
2022-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2022-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella |
2022-03-01 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2022-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2022-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2022-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2022-02-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2022-02-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker |
2022-02-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke |
2022-02-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2022-02-17 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2022-02-17 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2022-02-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2022-02-15 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2022-02-10 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Consent Calendar Insurance Committee; 017-000-000 |
2022-02-10 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Insurance Committee; by Voice Vote |
2022-02-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Insurance Committee |
2022-02-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2022-01-19 | House | Assigned to Insurance Committee |
2022-01-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2022-01-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2022-01-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2022-01-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar |
2022-01-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2022-01-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2022-01-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2022-01-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2022-01-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2022-01-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2022-01-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2022-01-05 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-05 | House | First Reading |
2021-12-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 10-22.3f | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 125 | 5-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 130 | 4003 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 165 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 5 | 356z.53 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 375 | 6.11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 5 | 5-1069.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
65 | 5 | 10-4-2.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |