IL HB4271 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Counties Code. Provides that the county authorities may (rather than shall) require that all auxiliary deputies be residents of the county served by them. Effective immediately.
Title
COUNTIES CD-AUXILIARY DEPUTIES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-25 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-03-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-03-08 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Counties & Townships Committee; 005-000-000 |
2018-01-30 | House | Assigned to Counties & Townships Committee |
2018-01-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-01-19 | House | First Reading |
2018-01-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Brad Halbrook |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
55 | 5 | 3-6013 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4271&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4271.htm |