IL HB4270 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Good Samaritan Act. Provides that a free medical clinic shall not be liable for civil damages as a result of acts or omissions in providing medical treatment, diagnosis, or advice, except for willful or wanton misconduct.
Title
GOOD SAMARITAN ACT-FREE CLINIC
Sponsors
Rep. David Olsen [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-13 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-03-07 | House | To Tort Liability Law Subcommittee |
2018-01-31 | House | To Tort Liability Law Subcommittee |
2018-01-24 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2018-01-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-01-19 | House | First Reading |
2018-01-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. David S. Olsen |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
745 | 49 | 30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4270&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4270.htm |