IL HB4269 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 22-11)
Status: Introduced on December 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-07 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-07 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Nurse Practice Act. Ratifies and approves the Nurse Licensure Compact, which allows for the issuance of multistate licenses that allow nurses to practice in their home state and other compact states. Provides that the Compact does not supersede existing State labor laws. Provides that the State may not share with or disclose to the Interstate Commission of Nurse Licensure Compact Administrators or any other state any of the contents of a nationwide criminal history records check conducted for the purpose of multistate licensure under the Nurse Licensure Compact.
Title
NURSE LICENSURE COMPACT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2022-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2022-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr |
2022-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2022-02-18 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2022-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2022-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2022-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2022-02-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Elik |
2022-02-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael T. Marron |
2022-02-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandra Hamilton |
2022-02-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2022-02-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2022-02-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste |
2022-02-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul Jacobs |
2022-02-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2022-02-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2022-02-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2022-02-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant |
2022-02-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook |
2022-02-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2022-02-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David Friess |
2022-02-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Luft |
2022-02-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2022-02-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2022-02-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2022-02-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi |
2022-02-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2022-02-03 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2022-02-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2022-02-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke |
2022-02-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2022-01-25 | House | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2022-01-05 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-05 | House | First Reading |
2021-12-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 65 | 85-10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
225 | 65 | 85-15 | New Code | See Bill Text |
225 | 65 | 85-5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
225 | 65 | Art. 85 heading | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4269&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB4269.htm |