IL HB4267 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Departments of State Government Law. Provides that each department of State government tasked with the implementation of all or any part of a law passed by the General Assembly shall be required to prepare and deliver a report to the General Assembly concerning its required implementation. Provides for the contents of the report. Provides for the filing of the report with the General Assembly. Requires the implementation reports to be made available on the Internet websites of the reporting department and the General Assembly. Provides that the implementation reporting requirement applies only to laws passed after the effective date of this amendatory Act. Effective immediately.
Title
DEPARTMENT IMPLEMENTING REPORT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-13 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-11 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee |
2018-04-10 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-10 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2018-04-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2018-03-21 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2018-01-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-01-19 | House | First Reading |
2018-01-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers |