IL HB4265 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that if an offender defaults in the payment of a fine or any installment of that fine, the court may issue a summons for his or her appearance (deletes warrant of arrest). Provides that the court may issue a warrant of arrest, if after being served with a summons, the offender fails to appear for the scheduled hearing.
Title
CD CORR-FINES-DEFAULT-WARRANT
Sponsors
Rep. Mary Flowers [D] | Rep. Steven Andersson [R] | Rep. Carol Ammons [D] | Rep. Andre Thapedi [D] |
Rep. Thaddeus Jones [D] | Sen. Elgie Sims [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-11-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 64 N: 33 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-11-15 - House - Motion in House (Y: 73 N: 21 NV: 9 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 35 N: 69 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-11-15 - House - Motion in House (Y: 73 N: 21 NV: 9 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 35 N: 69 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-11-27 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-11-27 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-11-27 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2018-11-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading November 27, 2018 |
2018-11-15 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-11-15 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 064-033-000 |
2018-11-15 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-11-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-11-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2018-11-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi |
2018-11-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2018-11-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-11-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2018-11-15 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-11-15 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-11-15 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-11-15 | House | Motion to Reconsider Vote - Prevails 073-021-000 |
2018-11-07 | House | Motion Filed to Reconsider Vote Rep. Steven A. Andersson |
2018-07-02 | House | Rule 19(b) / Motion Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-24 | House | Motion Filed to Reconsider Vote Rep. Steven A. Andersson |
2018-04-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2018-04-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson |
2018-04-24 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Lost 035-069-001 |
2018-04-13 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-13 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-09 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 009-002-000 |
2018-03-21 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2018-01-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-01-19 | House | First Reading |
2018-01-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
730 | 5 | 5-9-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |