IL HB4264 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-6)
Status: Passed on August 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-12 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0766
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-6)
Status: Passed on August 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-12 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0766
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Barber, Cosmetology, Esthetics, Hair Braiding, and Nail Technology Act of 1985. Provides that the program of study a person seeking licensure as a barber, cosmetologist, esthetician, hair braider, or nail technician must graduate from must include both domestic violence and sexual assault education as determined by rule of the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation. Requires that the continuing education needed to renew a license as a cosmetologist, esthetician, hair braider, or nail technician must include both domestic violence and sexual assault education as determined by rule of the Department.
Title
COSMETOLOGY-DOMESTIC VIOLENCE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 115 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-02 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 97 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-05-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-02 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 97 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-12 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0766 |
2016-08-12 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2017 |
2016-08-12 | House | Governor Approved |
2016-06-27 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2016-05-31 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2016-05-31 | House | House Concurs |
2016-05-31 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 115-002-000 |
2016-05-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2016-05-29 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; 007-000-000 |
2016-05-29 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee |
2016-05-26 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-05-26 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2016-05-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 2 |
2016-05-26 | House | Arrived in House |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Cunningham |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Licensed Activities and Pensions; 009-001-000 |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 25, 2016 |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Second Reading |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2016-05-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2016-05-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 23, 2016 |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Do Pass Licensed Activities and Pensions; 007-000-000 |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2016-05-13 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 27, 2016 |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2015-12-04 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-12-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-12-04 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2015-12-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2015-12-04 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2015-12-02 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 097-012-000 |
2015-12-02 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-12-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted |
2015-12-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2015-12-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; 008-000-000 |
2015-12-01 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee |
2015-10-30 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) December 4, 2015 |
2015-10-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-10-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2015-10-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2015-10-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2015-10-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2015-10-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2015-10-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2015-10-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2015-10-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2015-10-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2015-10-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2015-10-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2015-10-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2015-10-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore |
2015-10-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katherine Cloonen |
2015-10-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2015-10-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2015-10-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart |
2015-10-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2015-10-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2015-10-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2015-10-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2015-10-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-10-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2015-09-30 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) October 31, 2015 |
2015-09-02 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-09-02 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-09-02 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-09-02 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; 008-001-000 |
2015-09-01 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-09-01 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2015-08-31 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) September 30, 2015 |
2015-08-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2015-08-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2015-08-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2015-08-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2015-08-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2015-08-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2015-08-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2015-08-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2015-08-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2015-08-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2015-08-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2015-08-11 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) August 31, 2015 |
2015-08-11 | House | Assigned to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee |
2015-08-05 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-08-05 | House | First Reading |
2015-07-29 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 410 | 2-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 410 | 2-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 410 | 3-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 410 | 3-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 410 | 3-7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 410 | 3A-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 410 | 3A-6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 410 | 3C-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 410 | 3C-8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 410 | 3E-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 410 | 3E-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |