IL HB4263 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 8 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-02-18 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. Provides that no company, in any policy of accident or health insurance issued in the State, shall make or permit any distinction or discrimination against an individual solely because of the individual's vaccination status in the amount of payment of premiums or rates charged for policies of insurance, in the amount of any dividends or other benefits payable thereon, or in any other terms and conditions of the contract it makes. Provides that no company, in any policy of accident or health insurance issued in the State, shall refuse to insure or refuse to continue to insure an individual solely because of the individual's vaccination status.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

INS-PROHIBITED DISCRIMINATION

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-02-18HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2022-02-17HouseTo Special Issues (INS) Subcommittee
2022-02-09HouseAssigned to Insurance Committee
2022-01-05HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2022-01-05HouseFirst Reading
2021-12-08HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Amy Grant

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2155364Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback