IL HB4263 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-08 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on July 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-08 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. Provides that, for the 2016 and 2017 levy years, the Property Tax Extension Limitation Law applies to all taxing districts, including home rule units and school districts. Provides that, for the 2016 and 2017 levy years, the extension limitation under the Property Tax Extension Limitation Law is 0% or the rate of increase approved by the voters. Preempts home rule. Amends the State Mandates Act to require implementation without reimbursement. Amends the School Code. Creates a General State Aid Committee to propose a revised school funding formula for Illinois schools. Effective immediately.
Title
PTELL-SCHOOL FUNDING
Sponsors
Rep. Jack Franks [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-08 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2016-02-24 | House | To Property Tax Subcommittee |
2016-02-04 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2015-08-05 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-08-05 | House | First Reading |
2015-07-29 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jack D. Franks |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 18-21 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 805 | 8.39 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 18-185 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 200 | 18-205 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 200 | 18-213 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 200 | 18-214 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 200 | 18-242 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4263&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/09900HB4263.htm |