IL HB4248 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-03 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Workers' Compensation Act. Provides that, to obtain compensation under the Act, an employee bears the burden of showing, by a preponderance of the credible evidence, that he or she has sustained accidental injuries arising out of and in the course of the employment and the accidental injuries arising out of and in the course of the employment are the major contributing cause of the medical condition or injury for which compensation is being sought. Defines "major contributing cause". Provides that accidental injuries are not considered to be arising out of and in the course of employment under specified circumstances; adds provisions regarding certain injuries; provides that an injury, its occupational cause, and any resulting manifestations or disability must be established to a reasonable degree of medical certainty, based on objective relevant medical findings; and adds provisions regarding employees who are traveling or on a break. Makes changes regarding workers' compensation insurance. Provides for a reduction of an award by amounts an injured worker has previously received for prior injuries that resulted in permanency awards. Reduces certain payments under fee schedules. Provides that the Illinois Workers' Compensation Commission, rather than the Director of Insurance, shall adopt rules regarding electronic claims. Provides that the Commission shall establish the Workers' Compensation Ombudsman Program within the Commission and sets forth the Program's responsibilities. Creates the Workers' Compensation Edit, Alignment, and Reform Commission to develop a proposed recodification of the Workers' Compensation Act. Provides that the Commission shall procure and implement a computer system to replace its current computer system. Makes changes regarding unlawful acts and penalties. Makes other changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

WORKERS' COMPENSATION-VARIOUS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-01-03HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2016-11-16HouseAssigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
2015-07-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2015-07-09HouseFirst Reading
2015-07-08HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Jim Durkin

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
8203051Amended CodeCitation Text
82030514Amended CodeCitation Text
82030514.2New CodeSee Bill Text
82030514.3New CodeSee Bill Text
82030514.4New CodeSee Bill Text
82030519Amended CodeCitation Text
82030525.5Amended CodeCitation Text
8203054Amended CodeCitation Text
8203058Amended CodeCitation Text
8203058.1bAmended CodeCitation Text
8203058.2Amended CodeCitation Text
8203058.2aAmended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback