IL HB4247 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the State Finance Act. Provides that, for contracts entered into on or after the effective date of the amendatory Act, State appropriations may not be expended to rent or pay for access to physical space for booths, hospitality suites, or other physical space for units of local government, school districts, community college districts, or other taxing bodies at a convention or gathering of personnel. Excludes appropriations for physical space expenditures at any convention or gathering of public safety personnel. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CONVENTION SPACE APPROPRIATION

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-27HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-25HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 008-001-000
2018-04-09HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
2018-04-06HouseChief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Sam Yingling
2018-04-06HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2018-04-06HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2018-04-04HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-04HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. David McSweeney
2018-03-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-03-07HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2018-03-07HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 010-000-000
2018-03-07HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Executive Committee; 010-000-000
2018-02-26HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
2018-02-15HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-02-15HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. David McSweeney
2018-02-01HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-02-01HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. David McSweeney
2018-01-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2018-01-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie
2018-01-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow
2018-01-24HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2018-01-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2018-01-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2018-01-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2018-01-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2018-01-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2018-01-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2018-01-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-01-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-01-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-01-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2018-01-16HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2018-01-12HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. David McSweeney

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3010514dNew CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback