IL HB4237 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-9)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-9)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Creates an income tax credit in an amount equal to the contributions made by the taxpayer to the Illinois Excellence Fund during the taxable year. Amends the State Finance Act. Creates the Illinois Excellence Fund. Provides that moneys in the Fund shall be used for exclusively public purposes, as specified under Section 170 of the Internal Revenue Code relating to charitable contributions and gifts. Amends the Counties Code. Provides that the county board may establish a fund in the county treasury for the purpose of accepting contributions for exclusively public purposes, as specified under Section 170 of the Internal Revenue Code relating to charitable contributions and gifts and may provide for a credit against the taxpayer's property tax liability in an amount equal to the amount of the contribution. Effective immediately.
Title
INC TX-CHARITABLE CONTRIBUTION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 93 N: 15 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 93 N: 15 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-07-02 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2018-05-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1, 2 |
2018-05-24 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-001-001 |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Morrison |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 24, 2018 |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 23, 2018 |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Revenue; 007-000-000 |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Postponed - Revenue |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Postponed - Revenue |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Nybo |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 23, 2018 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-18 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 093-015-000 |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2018-04-17 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2018-04-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo |
2018-04-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2018-04-13 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-13 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2018-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2018-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2018-04-06 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-06 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2018-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger |
2018-03-01 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-03-01 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-02-14 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-02-14 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 008-001-000 |
2018-02-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Revenue & Finance Committee; by Voice Vote |
2018-02-14 | House | Remains in Revenue & Finance Committee |
2018-02-14 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Revenue & Finance Committee; 004-000-000 |
2018-02-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2018-02-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2018-02-06 | House | To Income Tax Subcommittee |
2018-01-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang |
2018-01-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen |
2018-01-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2018-01-24 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2018-01-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2018-01-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris |
2018-01-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2018-01-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor |
2018-01-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-01-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-01-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2018-01-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2018-01-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2018-01-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow |
2018-01-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2018-01-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2018-01-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie |
2018-01-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2018-01-11 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2018-01-11 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2018-01-11 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2018-01-11 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 105 | 5.886 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 105 | 6z-105 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 5 | 228 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 5 | 5-1005 | Amended Code | Citation Text |