IL HB4233 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Children with Disabilities Article of the School Code. Requires a school district to provide notification to the parent or guardian of a student with an individualized education program (IEP) that the student may be eligible to receive additional specified services, benefits, or resources. Provides that the written notification must be provided no later than 30 days following the implementation of the initial IEP and once a year thereafter. Effective immediately.
Title
SCH CD-SPECIAL ED RESOURCES
Sponsors
Sen. Karina Villa [D] | Rep. Will Guzzardi [D] | Sen. Mary Edly-Allen [D] | Rep. Dan Brady [R] |
Rep. Edgar Gonzalez [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-17 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2020-02-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen |
2020-02-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2020-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr. |
2020-01-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-01-27 | House | First Reading |
2020-01-23 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Karina Villa |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4233&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB4233.htm |