IL HB4228 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Enrolled on January 5 2023 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-05 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on January 5 2023 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-05 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Decennial Committees on Local Government Efficiency Act. Defines "governing board" to mean the governing body of a governmental unit, including, but not limited to, the governing body of a road district. Provides that "governmental unit" means all entities that levy taxes and are also units of local government, as defined in Section 1 of Article VII of the Illinois Constitution, except municipalities and counties (rather than includes all units of local government that may levy any tax, except municipalities and counties). Provides that a highway commissioner of a township road district in a county with a population under 400,000 and the township board of the same township may form a joint committee on local government efficiency (currently, the governmental unit must form a single committee). Makes other changes. Amends the State Mandates Act to require implementation without reimbursement. Effective immediately.
Title
MENTAL HEALTH-VALIDATION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-01-05 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 104 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-11-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - House - Motion in House (Y: 87 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-11-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - House - Motion in House (Y: 87 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-05 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2023-01-05 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 House Concurs 104-001-000 |
2023-01-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2023-01-05 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Revenue & Finance Committee; 014-000-000 |
2022-12-30 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) January 10, 2023 |
2022-12-01 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2022-11-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2022-11-30 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 3 |
2022-11-30 | House | Arrived in House |
2022-11-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2022-11-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2022-11-30 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2022-11-30 | Senate | 3/5 Vote Required |
2022-11-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Morrison |
2022-11-30 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2022-11-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 016-000-000 |
2022-11-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2022-11-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2022-11-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2022-11-29 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2022-11-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading November 29, 2022 |
2022-11-16 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Purusant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1) the following amendments will remain in the Committee on Assignments. |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Doris Turner |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Executive |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 6, 2022 |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 8, 2022 |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Doris Turner |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 5, 2022 |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Doris Turner |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-03-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 8, 2022 |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2022-03-04 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 086-018-000 |
2022-03-03 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day |
2022-03-02 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2022-03-01 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2022-03-01 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2022-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr |
2022-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2022-02-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2022-02-17 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Revenue & Finance Committee; 018-000-000 |
2022-02-17 | House | Reported Back To Revenue & Finance Committee; |
2022-02-17 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Revenue & Finance Committee; 006-000-000 |
2022-02-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker |
2022-02-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2022-02-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer |
2022-02-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2022-02-02 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2022-02-02 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2022-01-27 | House | To Property Tax Subcommittee |
2022-01-19 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2022-01-05 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-05 | House | First Reading |
2021-11-23 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 200 | 18-103 | New Code | See Bill Text |
405 | 20 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
50 | 835 | 1.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 105 | 1.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 5 | 5-25025 | Amended Code | Citation Text |