IL HB4218 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Firearm Owners Identification Card Act. Defines "patient" for purposes of the Act as a person who: is admitted as an in-patient or resident of a public or private mental health facility for mental health treatment under the Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Code as an informal admission, a voluntary admission, a minor admission, an emergency admission, or an involuntary admission; or is otherwise provided mental health treatment as an in-patient or resident by a public or private mental health facility, unless the treatment was solely for an alcohol abuse disorder and no other secondary substance abuse disorder or mental illness; or a person who voluntarily or involuntarily receives mental health treatment as an out-patient or is otherwise provided services by a public or private mental health facility, and who poses a clear and present danger to himself, herself, or to others.
Title
FOID-PATIENT DEFINITION
Sponsors
Rep. Barbara Wheeler [R] | Rep. Grant Wehrli [R] | Rep. Patricia Bellock [R] | Rep. Sheri Jesiel [R] |
Rep. Margo McDermed [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-25 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-18 | House | Motion Withdrawn Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
2018-04-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
2018-04-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-13 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-12 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 013-000-000 |
2018-04-12 | House | Reported Back To Judiciary - Criminal Committee; |
2018-04-12 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 005-000-000 |
2018-04-12 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2018-04-12 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Judiciary - Criminal Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2018-04-10 | House | Motion Filed to Discharge Committee Judiciary - Criminal Committee; Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
2018-04-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 To Firearms and Firearm Safety Subcommittee |
2018-04-09 | House | To Firearms and Firearm Safety Subcommittee |
2018-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2018-03-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-03-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
2018-02-28 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Sheri Jesiel |
2018-02-28 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel |
2018-02-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2018-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2018-02-05 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2018-01-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-01-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-01-05 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
430 | 65 | 1.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |