IL HB4213 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on November 2 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-12 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 2 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-12 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Local Accessory Dwelling Unit Act. Defines terms. Provides that a unit of local government may not prohibit the building or usage of accessory dwelling units in the unit of local government. Provides that a unit of local government may provide reasonable regulations relating to the size and location of accessory dwelling units similar to other accessory structures unless a regulation would have the effect of prohibiting accessory dwelling units. Limits home rule powers.
Title
LOCAL-ACCESSORY DWELLING UNITS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2024-04-05 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-03-12 | House | To Local Government Subcommittee |
2024-03-05 | House | Assigned to Cities & Villages Committee |
2023-11-07 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-11-07 | House | First Reading |
2023-11-02 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kam Buckner |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4213&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB4213.htm |