IL HB4212 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 19-2)
Status: Passed on July 27 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0093
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 19-2)
Status: Passed on July 27 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0093
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Military and Veterans Court Act. Permits the Chief Judge of a judicial circuit to establish a military and veterans court program for veterans and active duty service members. Provides that in such judicial circuits, a veteran or active duty service member who has a substance abuse problem and who is subject to a criminal proceeding may with the consent of the prosecution and with the approval of the court be admitted into a military and veterans court program. Excludes from the program a veteran or active duty service member: charged with a crime of violence within the past 10 years, excluding incarceration time; who denies his or her use of or addiction to drugs; or who does not demonstrate a willingness to participate in a treatment program. Provides that the military and veterans court program shall include a regimen of graduated requirements, rewards and sanctions, including: fines, costs, restitution, public service employment, incarceration of up to 120 days, individual and group therapy, drug analysis testing, close court monitoring, educational or vocational counseling, and other requirements to fulfill the program. Provides for revocation and resentencing of the person who violates the conditions of the program or who engages in criminal conduct rendering the person unsuitable for the program, or who is not performing satisfactorily or not benefiting from the education, treatment or rehabilitation.
Title
MILITARY-VETERANS COURT ACT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-05-15 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-02 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-02 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-27 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0093 | |
2009-07-27 | Effective Date July 27, 2009 | |
2009-07-27 | Governor Approved | |
2009-06-12 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-15 | Passed Both Houses | |
2009-05-15 | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 | |
2009-05-15 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson | |
2009-05-13 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 14, 2009 | |
2009-05-13 | Second Reading | |
2009-05-06 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2009 | |
2009-05-06 | Do Pass Judiciary; 010-000-000 | |
2009-04-29 | Postponed - Judiciary | |
2009-04-22 | Assigned to Judiciary | |
2009-04-15 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-04-15 | First Reading | |
2009-04-02 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff | |
2009-04-02 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 21, 2009 | |
2009-04-02 | Arrive in Senate | |
2009-04-02 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 117-000-000 | |
2009-04-02 | Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner | |
2009-04-02 | Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark H. Beaubien, Jr. | |
2009-04-02 | Co-Sponsor Rep. Rosemary Mulligan | |
2009-04-02 | Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandy Cole | |
2009-04-01 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-04-01 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote | |
2009-04-01 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-04-01 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000 | |
2009-03-31 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-03-31 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael W. Tryon | |
2009-03-17 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kay Hatcher | |
2009-03-12 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-12 | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 007-000-000 | |
2009-03-12 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia | |
2009-03-12 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Holbrook | |
2009-03-12 | Remains in Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee | |
2009-03-12 | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 003-000-000 | |
2009-03-12 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Cross | |
2009-03-10 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard | |
2009-03-10 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Sacia | |
2009-03-10 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Renée Kosel | |
2009-03-10 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock | |
2009-03-04 | Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee | |
2009-02-27 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. JoAnn D. Osmond | |
2009-02-27 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rich Brauer | |
2009-02-27 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry L. Mitchell | |
2009-02-27 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Raymond Poe | |
2009-02-27 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy Ramey, Jr. | |
2009-02-27 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ronald A. Wait | |
2009-02-27 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Bost | |
2009-02-27 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ron Stephens | |
2009-02-27 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-27 | First Reading | |
2009-02-27 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael W. Tryon |