IL HB4210 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Abortion Law of 1975. Defines "Down syndrome". Prohibits a physician from intentionally performing an abortion with knowledge that the pregnant woman is seeking the abortion solely on account of the fetus having a test result indicating Down syndrome, a prenatal diagnosis of Down syndrome, or any other reason to believe that the fetus has Down syndrome. Effective immediately.
Title
ABORTION-DOWN SYNDROME
Sponsors
Rep. Allen Skillicorn [R] | Rep. Thomas Morrison [R] | Rep. Monica Bristow [D] | Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-01-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-01-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-01-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie |
2018-01-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow |
2018-01-03 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2018-01-03 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 510 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 510 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 510 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 510 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4210&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4210.htm |