IL HB4208 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-0)
Status: Introduced on April 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-22 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Election Code. Provides that specified government agencies shall assist individuals to register to vote unless the individual chooses to not register. Provides that employees of designated government agencies must inform the applicant of his or her right to opt out of this voter registration. Provides that employees must inform the applicant that if he or she is not a citizen of the United States, he or she must opt out. Provides that applicants opting out of the automatic voter registration shall not be required to disclose whether he or she is a citizen of the United States or his or her reason for opting out.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AUTOMATIC VOTER REGISTRATION

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-22HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2016-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo
2016-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
2016-04-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Eddie Lee Jackson, Sr.
2016-04-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2016-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2016-04-08HouseCommittee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) April 22, 2016
2016-04-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2016-04-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser
2016-03-23HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2016-03-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2016-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2016-03-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Pamela Reaves-Harris
2016-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Scott Drury
2016-02-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2016-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2016-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2016-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2016-02-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2016-02-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto
2016-02-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kenneth Dunkin
2016-02-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2016-02-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2016-02-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2016-02-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2016-02-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2016-02-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2016-02-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2016-02-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2016-02-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2016-02-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2016-02-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2016-02-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2015-10-08HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2015-05-30HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz
2015-04-29HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2015-04-29HouseFirst Reading
2015-04-29HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1051A-16.6Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback