IL HB4199 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 60-8)
Status: Introduced on March 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-08-01 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-08-01 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Makes appropriations to the Department on Aging for grants and for administrative expenses associated with the purchase of services covered by the Community Care Program, and for other purposes. Effective July 1, 2015.
Title
$AGING-GRANTS-COMMUNITY CARE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-01 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2016-03-23 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2015-05-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2015-05-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2015-05-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John D. Anthony |
2015-05-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2015-05-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frank J. Mautino |
2015-05-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz |
2015-05-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2015-05-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2015-05-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2015-05-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2015-05-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita |
2015-05-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2015-05-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2015-05-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
2015-05-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Donald L. Moffitt |
2015-05-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2015-05-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Adam Brown |
2015-05-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2015-05-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2015-05-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2015-05-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2015-05-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2015-05-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2015-05-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2015-05-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore |
2015-05-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Pamela Reaves-Harris |
2015-05-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2015-05-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2015-05-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2015-04-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang |
2015-04-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Bradley |
2015-04-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2015-04-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2015-04-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edward J. Acevedo |
2015-04-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2015-04-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2015-04-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2015-04-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Eddie Lee Jackson, Sr. |
2015-04-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2015-04-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2015-04-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kenneth Dunkin |
2015-04-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2015-04-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2015-04-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2015-04-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2015-04-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2015-04-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2015-04-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2015-04-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2015-04-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2015-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Esther Golar |
2015-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2015-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2015-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2015-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2015-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2015-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2015-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2015-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2015-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell |
2015-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2015-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2015-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2015-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2015-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2015-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Monique D. Davis |
2015-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2015-04-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-04-14 | House | First Reading |
2015-03-27 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mike Smiddy |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4199&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/PDF/09900HB4199.pdf |