IL HB4166 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-27 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul D. Froehlich
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-27 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul D. Froehlich
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Officials and Employees Ethics Act. Expands the jurisdiction of the Legislative Ethics Commission to include matters arising under the Illinois Governmental Ethics Act and violations of other related laws and rules. Requires the Legislative Inspector General's summary investigation reports to be delivered to the Legislative Ethics Commission. With respect to the confidentiality of the Legislative Inspector General's reports, (i) removes the condition of necessity for the disclosure of reports to law enforcement authorities, ultimate jurisdictional authorities, and the Legislative Ethics Commission and (ii) authorizes the Legislative Ethics Commission to disclose or publish summary investigation reports, based on criteria established by the Commission by rule. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.
Title
LEGISLATIVE ETHICS COMMISSION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-27 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul D. Froehlich | |
2009-03-13 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-03-04 | Assigned to Joint Committee on Government Reform | |
2009-02-27 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-27 | First Reading | |
2009-02-27 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4166&GAID=10&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/HB/09600HB4166.htm |